ND HB1395 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 1 and 7 of section 62.1-01-01, subsection 1 of section 62.1-02-04, subdivision m of subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05, and section 62.1-04-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to dangerous weapons and retired law enforcement officers; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Dangerous weapons and retired law enforcement officers; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2017-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-24 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 4, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |