ND HB1394 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 53-06.1-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rent limits for electronic pull tab devices.
Title
Rent limits for electronic pull tab devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 15 |
2019-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 25 nays 22 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 20 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2019-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |