ND HB1390 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a suicide fatality review commission; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
The creation of a suicide fatality review commission; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Mike Beltz [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Sen. Sean Cleary [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/12 |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 16 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-20 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 4 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:58 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Workforce Development |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12 |
2023-02-14 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee Hearing 04:25 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |