ND HB1387 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 045
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 045
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authorization of installation of fixtures on a rental property; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the authorization of installation of fixtures on a rental property; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Dosch [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Dave Weiler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 045 | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Received from House | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 060 nays 033 | |
2009-01-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-21 | Rereferred to Judiciary | |
2009-01-21 | Request return from committee | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1387.html |