ND HB1385 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 61-02-24 and 61-02-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to tribal contracts with the state water commission.
Title
Tribal contracts with the state water commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2023-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2023-03-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 0 2 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:13 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:20 |
2023-02-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |