ND HB1384 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to housing as an allowable expense in establishing basic care facility payment rates; and to amend and reenact sections 50-24.4-01 and 50-24.4-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to housing as a cost or employee benefit in the ratesetting system for nursing homes.
Title
Housing as a cost or employee benefit in the ratesetting system for nursing homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] |
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 65 |
2013-02-07 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1384.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0340-01000.pdf |