ND HB1383 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 4.1-01 and a new section to chapter 49-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of an environmental impact mitigation fund and to mitigating direct environmental impacts; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-01-18, sections 49-22-05.1 and 49-22-09, and subsection 4 of section 49-22-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the federal environmental law impact review committee, exclusion and avoidance areas, the factors considered by the public service commission when evaluating and designating sites, corridors, and routes, and state agency rules; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
The federal environmental law impact review committee, exclusion and avoidance areas, the factors considered by the public service commission when evaluating and designating sites, corridors, and routes, and state agency rules; to provide for a report to the legislative management; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2019-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 19 |
2019-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Schaible Kreun Piepkorn |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Schreiber-Beck Brandenburg Boe |
2019-04-08 | House | Refused to concur |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 42 nays 5 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on table |
2019-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 17 |
2019-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2 |
2019-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2019-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |