ND HB1380 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4 and a new section to chapter 21-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a legacy sinking and interest fund and a legacy earnings fund; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 21-10-06 and section 21-10-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to funds invested by the state investment board and legacy fund definitions; to repeal House Bill No. 1038, as approved by the sixty-seventh legislative assembly, relating to a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide for a transfer; to create a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide for a transfer; to create a legislative management legacy fund earnings committee; to provide a statement of legislative intent; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 05/10 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 9 |
2021-04-29 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-29 | House | Appoint Rep. Pollert to replace Rep. Delzer on conference committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Sorvaag Bell Heckaman |
2021-04-23 | House | Conference committee appointed Delzer Vigesaa Boe |
2021-04-23 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 22 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 3 2 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |