ND HB1375 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of national guard member benefits.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of national guard member benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/04 | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by Governor 04/04 | |
2011-04-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-15 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-11 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Received from House | |
2011-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |