ND HB1368 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 44-08-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to travel expenses for state employees.
Title
Travel expenses for state employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2013-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2013-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 2 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2013-02-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 3 0 |
2013-02-12 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |