ND HB1367 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Triplett A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to local permits and charity local permits.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Triplett A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to local permits and charity local permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-10 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 002 | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-11 | Received from House | |
2009-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 081 nays 012 | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 001 | |
2009-02-06 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1367.html |