ND HB1361 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein, J. Lee, Triplett A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 9 to section 43-55-08 and two new sections to chapter 43-55 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to professional employer organizations; to amend and reenact sections 43-55-03 and 43-55-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing requirements for professional employer organizations; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein, J. Lee, Triplett A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 9 to section 43-55-08 and two new sections to chapter 43-55 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to professional employer organizations; to amend and reenact sections 43-55-03 and 43-55-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing requirements for professional employer organizations; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading passed, y 089 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-18 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-18 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La | |
2009-02-17 | Received from House | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading passed, y 092 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-13 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-12 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and La |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1361.html |