ND HB1360 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 40-49-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bid requirements for park districts; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Bid requirements for park districts; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R] |
Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 20, Emergency clause carried |
2019-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee |