ND HB1358 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 53-06.1-03 and section 53-06.1-07.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to rodeo calcuttas.
Title
Rodeo calcuttas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 61 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 40 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 0 2 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 61 nays 30 |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |