ND HB1358 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 38-08 and a new subsection to section 38-08-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the operation of underground gathering pipelines and the sharing of information by a surface owner; to amend and reenact subsection 18 of section 38-08-02, subdivisions d and l of subsection 1 of section 38-08-04, subsection 6 of section 38-08-04, and section 38-08-04.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exception to confidentiality of well data, to underground gathering pipelines, to temporarily abandoned status, and the uses of the abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide a transfer; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
An exception to confidentiality of well data, to underground gathering pipelines, to temporarily abandoned status, and the uses of the abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; to provide a report to the legislative management; to provide a transfer; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. David O'Connell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-14 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2015-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 23 0 0 |
2015-02-10 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |