ND HB1356 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 077
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 077
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to provide for the prioritization of new pavement on a portion of United States highway 83.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook A BILL for an Act to provide for the prioritization of new pavement on a portion of United States highway 83.
Sponsors
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-30 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 077 | |
2009-01-26 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 003 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1356.html |