ND HB1347 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact five new sections to chapter 6-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state treasurer and financial institutions engaged in boycotts of energy companies; and to amend and reenact section 6-01-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions.
Title
Definitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Mitch Ostlie [R] | Rep. Austen Schauer [R] |
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Cole Conley [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 3 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 90 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 03:25 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |