ND HB1344 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Nelson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 21-04-09 and 21-06-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public deposits.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Nelson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 21-04-09 and 21-06-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public deposits.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacy Dahl [R] | Rep. Duane DeKrey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-28 | Received from House | |
2009-01-27 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1344.html |