ND HB1343 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 4-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an apiary setback; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
An apiary setback; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 79 |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 1 3 |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |