ND HB1343 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-11.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to polling places for elections held by mail ballot.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-11.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to polling places for elections held by mail ballot.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 040 nays 003 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-26 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-02-06 | Received from House | |
2009-02-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1343.html |