ND HB1329 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-21-41.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child restraint devices.
Title
Child restraint devices.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Rep. John Wall [R] | Rep. Bill Amerman [D] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. Spencer Berry [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 47 |
2013-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |