ND HB1320 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-15-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to ballot retention requirements.
Title
Ballot retention requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 28 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 28 nays 66 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 03:49 |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Political Subdivisions |