ND HB1320 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-22 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to deductions from income for determining medical assistance eligibility.
Title
Deductions from income for determining medical assistance eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Sen. Gerald Uglem [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Governor 04/20 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-08 | Returned to House | |
2011-04-08 | Request return from committee | |
2011-03-11 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Received from House | |
2011-02-14 | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 0 | |
2011-01-27 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-26 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-01-24 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-14 | Request return from committee | |
2011-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |