ND HB1318 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for agriculture development impact grants.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for agriculture development impact grants.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Peter Silbernagel [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 43 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 18 |
2015-02-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |