ND HB1317 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing financial assistance for costs associated with a pregnancy that results in an adoption of a newborn.
Title
Providing financial assistance for costs associated with a pregnancy that results in an adoption of a newborn.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 0 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 91 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |