ND HB1317 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a student loan paydown program for early childhood education and care providers; and to provide an appropriation.
Title
A student loan paydown program for early childhood education and care providers; and to provide an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57 |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 5 0 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1317.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0473-03000.pdf |