ND HB1312 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-06-05.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to continuation of an evidence-based online virtual mental health and suicide prevention simulation-based training program for schools.
Title
Continuation of an evidence-based online virtual mental health and suicide prevention simulation-based training program for schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28 |
2023-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2023-03-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 7 |
2023-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee Hearing 03:17 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |