ND HB1312 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 083
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 083
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the minimum monthly maintenance needs allowance maximum; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the minimum monthly maintenance needs allowance maximum; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 010 nays 083 | |
2009-02-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 011 n 002 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1312.html |