ND HB1303 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 59
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 5-03-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to alcoholic beverage tax on diluted beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverage tax on diluted beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 35 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 59 |
2023-02-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-02 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 11:13 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |