ND HB1303 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dever A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.4-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to factors considered in determining nursing home rates.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dever A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 50-24.4-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to factors considered in determining nursing home rates.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Brenda Heller [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Sen. Gerald Uglem [R] |
Rep. Alon Wieland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 000 | |
2009-04-01 | Concurred | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services | |
2009-02-05 | Received from House | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1303.html |