ND HB1298 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-11.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to proof of liability insurance for early childhood programs; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Proof of liability insurance for early childhood programs; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Paul Thomas [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 44 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 44 nays 49 |
2023-02-03 | House | Reconsidered |
2023-02-02 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60 |
2023-02-01 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:57 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |