ND HB1296 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the confidentiality of booking photos; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 44-04-18.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal information.
Title
Criminal information.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49 |
2021-02-10 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2021-02-04 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |