ND HB1296 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Grindberg, Hogue A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 27-08.1-01 and section 27-08.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limits on small claims court actions.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Grindberg, Hogue A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 27-08.1-01 and section 27-08.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limits on small claims court actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-09 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-10 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Received from House | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 089 nays 004 | |
2009-01-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 003 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1296.html |