ND HB1295 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 50-24.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical assistance benefits for family planning services; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Medical assistance benefits for family planning services; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Rep. Jessica Haak [D] | Rep. Gail Mooney [D] | Rep. Naomi Muscha [D] |
Rep. Mary Schneider [D] | Rep. Kris Wallman [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 22 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 22 nays 66 |
2015-02-11 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |