ND HB1291 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-04-12, subsection 1 of section 39-04-18, and subsection 4 of section 39-04-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to semitrailer and farm trailer plates; and to provide for application.
Title
Semitrailer and farm trailer plates; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Donald Vigesaa [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Jonell Bakke [D] |
Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |