ND HB1282 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 15 of section 57-02-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to determination of true and full value of property for property tax assessment purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Determination of true and full value of property for property tax assessment purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Fischer [R] | Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Rep. Dave Weiler [R] | Rep. Dwight Wrangham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 87 | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 | |
2011-02-02 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1282.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0152-01000.pdf |