ND HB1279 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Possession of a firearm; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2017-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-27 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 0 4 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |