ND HB1275 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact three new subdivisions to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an individual income tax deduction for a portion of retirement benefits for firefighters, police, highway patrol officers, military personnel, and government employees; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
An individual income tax deduction for a portion of retirement benefits for firefighters, police, highway patrol officers, military personnel, and government employees; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Rep. Ed Gruchalla [D] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Rep. Scot Kelsh [D] |
Rep. Matthew Klein [R] | Rep. Ralph Metcalf [D] | Sen. Dave Nething [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 61 | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 | |
2011-01-19 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1275.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0501-01000.pdf |