ND HB1270 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 4.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the certification of gravel pits and forage; to repeal section 63-01.1-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to weed-free certification of gravel pits and forage; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Dotzenrod, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 4.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the certification of gravel pits and forage; to repeal section 63-01.1-12.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to weed-free certification of gravel pits and forage; to provide an appropriation; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-13 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-11 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-10 | Second reading passed, y 045 n 001 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading passed, y 094 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 021 n 000 | |
2009-02-09 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-29 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1270.html |