ND HB1265 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 091
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 091
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Krebsbach A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision j of subsection 1 of section 57-15-14.2 and subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 57-15-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school district tax levies.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Krebsbach A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision j of subsection 1 of section 57-15-14.2 and subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 57-15-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to school district tax levies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 091 | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Flakoll Freborg Bakke | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed L. Meier D. Johnson Myxter | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-09 | Received from House | |
2009-02-06 | Second reading, passed, yeas 076 nays 016 | |
2009-02-03 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 014 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1265.html |