ND HB1264 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Krebsbach A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 21-09-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to validation of bonds issued by public bodies of the state before July 1, 2009.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Cook, Krebsbach A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 21-09-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to validation of bonds issued by public bodies of the state before July 1, 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-02-06 | Received from House | |
2009-02-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1264.html |