ND HB1258 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-39.1 and chapter 15-39.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a defined contribution retirement plan for teachers; to amend and reenact sections 15-39.1-09 and 15-39.1-30 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a defined contribution retirement plan for teachers; to provide a penalty; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
A defined contribution retirement plan for teachers; to provide a penalty; to provide a statement of legislative intent; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Andrist [R] | Rep. Bette Grande [R] | Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 56 | |
2011-02-17 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 8 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 6 0 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |