ND HB1249 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the building space needs of the legislative branch.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the building space needs of the legislative branch.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned to House |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |