ND HB1244 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-38-01.16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the income tax credit for employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The income tax credit for employment of individuals with developmental disabilities or severe mental illness; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 |
2023-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2023-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Concurred |
2023-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:51 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-13 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-01-13 | House | Request return from committee |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |