ND HB1241 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a firearm or dangerous weapon in a gaming site.
Title
A firearm or dangerous weapon in a gaming site.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2013-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 |
2013-04-08 | House | Concurred |
2013-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 39 nays 6 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0 |
2013-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |