ND HB1231 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 53-06.1-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to distributors and manufacturers of games of chance.
Title
Distributors and manufacturers of games of chance.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/16 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 51 nays 39 |
2015-04-13 | House | Concurred |
2015-03-13 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 20 |
2015-02-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:50 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |