ND HB1228 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 57-38-01.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the carryforward period for excess geothermal, solar, wind, or biomass energy device income tax credits; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The carryforward period for excess geothermal, solar, wind, or biomass energy device income tax credits; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2015-04-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-26 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19 |
2015-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |