ND HB1220 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 47-16-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to lessor security deposit limitations.
Title
Lessor security deposit limitations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] |
Rep. Mary Schneider [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2017-03-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 3 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |