ND HB1218 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 20.1-08-04.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hunting by nonresidents who own land in North Dakota.
Title
Hunting by nonresidents who own land in North Dakota.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Sen. Dale Patten [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |