ND HB1213 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 19-24.1-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana designated caregivers; to amend and reenact section 19-03.1-01, subsection 5 of section 19-03.1-05, subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-22.2, section 19-03.1-22.3, subsections 1, 7, and 9 of section 19-03.1-23, subsection 12 of section 19-03.4-01, sections 19-03.4-03, 19-03.4-04, and 19-24.1-01, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-03, subsection 3 of section 19-24.1-04, sections 19-24.1-10 and 19-24.1-13, paragraph 2 of subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 19-24.1-14, subdivision a of subsection 1 of section 19-24.1-15, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-16, section 19-24.1-17, subsection 4 of section 19-24.1-18, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-20, subsection 3 of section 19-24.1-26, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-37, section 19-24.1-39, and subsection 1 of section 39-20-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The medical marijuana program; to provide for a legislative management report; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Westlind [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-28 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-26 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-26 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Lee Anderson K. Roers |
2021-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed Westlind M. Ruby Beltz |
2021-04-16 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-15 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 3 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5, Emergency clause carried |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 1 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |